This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:33:10 (UTC).

CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. VS. RUI SHI

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 CHF-IRVINE, L L C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RUI SHI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C.

Defendant

RUI SHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF COREY E. TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

WRIT (ISSUED 11/08/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/08/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2017.

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12250097 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12073819.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12250097 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12073819.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233332 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057012.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233332 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057012.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/08/17) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/08/17) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/07/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/03/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 12/04/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 12/04/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/07/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/07/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12250097 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12073819.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/08/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/08/17) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1438559 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2017 03:38:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 11/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3604567 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2017 03:25:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233332 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CHF-IRVINE, L.L.C. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600456 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2017 05:08:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.