This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:17:39 (UTC).

CHERYL KEYS VS. ALLEN GAGE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 CHERYL KEYS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALLEN GAGE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERYL KEYS

Defendants

JOY GAGE

ALLEN GAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11452055 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11275947.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11452055 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11275947.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/09/2014.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/09/2014.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 10/29/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 10/29/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/10/13) RECEIVED ON 09/09/2013.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/10/13) RECEIVED ON 09/09/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 09/10/13) RECEIVED ON 09/09/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 09/10/13) RECEIVED ON 09/09/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

JUDGMENT FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/17/2014

JUDGMENT FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/17/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (CCP 1169) FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (CCP 1169) FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 08/12/2013

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/10/13) RECEIVED ON 09/09/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 09/10/13) RECEIVED ON 09/09/2013.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 01/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE) FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 01/09/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2299923 RECEIVED ON 01/09/2014 10:49:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 10/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 09/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 357769 RECEIVED ON 09/09/2013 01:48:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KEYS, CHERYL ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270798 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 04:00:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less