This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/19/2022 at 14:50:11 (UTC).

CHAVEZ - ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 CHAVEZ - ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT was filed as a Probate - Mental Health lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Mental Health

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH

Respondent

ALVARO CHAVEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Respondent Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: MENTAL HEALTH HEARING; Department: C09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 02/08/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/22/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/22/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (AGREEMENT FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT SERVICES) FILED BY COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 02/01/2022; Filing Party: COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE ON 02/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 02/01/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/08/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MENTAL HEALTH HEARING 01/25/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/01/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPLAN FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/10/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21098744 RECEIVED ON 12/10/2021 01:33:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/10/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER APPOINTING OC PD AUTHORIZING COPIES OF MEDICAL) FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER ON 12/08/2021; Filing Party: PUBLIC DEFENDER ON 12/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1926023 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 09:56:54 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/07/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMENTAL HEALTH HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/14/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31094178 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 08:03:56 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/07/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER FOR ASSISTED OUTPATIENT TREATMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/07/2021; Filing Party: ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH CARE AGENCY-BEHAVIORAL HEALTH ON 12/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less