This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:19:45 (UTC).

CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY VS. MICHAEL MADDEN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL MADDEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants

MICHAEL MADDEN CO., INC

MICHAEL MADDEN

THE PAPER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN J. FERBER

Defendant Attorney

HALAS & MUHAR

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 02/19/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 02/19/2014

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MICHAEL MADDEN CO., INC; THE PAPER COMPANY ON 10/18/2013

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MICHAEL MADDEN CO., INC; THE PAPER COMPANY ON 10/18/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 10/07/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 10/07/2013

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE PAPER COMPANY ON 10/18/2013

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE PAPER COMPANY ON 10/18/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K$10K

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K$10K

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 10/01/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 10/01/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 02/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3115297 RECEIVED ON 02/19/2014 01:31:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K$10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY THE PAPER COMPANY ON 10/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MICHAEL MADDEN CO., INC; THE PAPER COMPANY ON 10/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 372846 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2013 03:07:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 10/07/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1116617 RECEIVED ON 10/07/2013 01:55:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 10/01/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2283775 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2013 01:43:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CHARTIS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1105667 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 05:42:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less