This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 07:48:47 (UTC).

CHARLES MANTYLA VS. PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 CHARLES MANTYLA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charles Mantyla

Mikaren Manyyla

Defendants

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

PHH Mortgage Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CDLG, PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802094.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802094.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 12/03/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 12/03/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 12/03/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 12/03/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GEORGE; Department: C24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1924757 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2021 05:28:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41270995 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2021 05:28:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802094.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1920180 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2021 08:25:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 11/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MANTYLA, CHARLES; MANYYLA, MIKAREN ON 11/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHH Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant