This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/31/2021 at 06:39:52 (UTC).

CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. VS. DUC TRAN

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 CHARLES E THOMAS COMPANY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DUC TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles E. Thomas Company, Inc.

Defendants

Duc Tran

Mai Tran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hitchcock, Bowman & Schachter

Defendant Attorney

Lakewood Law Firm

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/25/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/25/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/24/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/24/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 06/14/2021

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 06/14/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41204394 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41204394 REJECTED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1857910 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1857910 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 03/18/2021

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 03/18/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 07/01/2020

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 07/01/2020

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/04/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/04/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 03/25/2020

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 03/25/2020

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/05/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/05/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12667539 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12492238.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K, 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 740.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12667539 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12492238.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TRAN, DUC; TRAN, MAI ON 12/02/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY TRAN, DUC; TRAN, MAI ON 12/02/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAN, DUC; TRAN, MAI ON 12/02/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAN, DUC; TRAN, MAI ON 12/02/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 10/28/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 10/28/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 10/28/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 10/28/2019

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/25/2021

DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021

DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/25/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2021

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31054680 RECEIVED ON 08/25/2021 07:53:49 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/24/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21056886 RECEIVED ON 08/24/2021 09:20:17 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1858481 RECEIVED ON 06/14/2021 10:46:24 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 06/14/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41204394 REJECTED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2021
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 10/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 10/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 10/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 10/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41027944 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2019 09:11:51 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12613620 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12438095.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2019

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1660358 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2019 03:30:48 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CHARLES E. THOMAS COMPANY, INC. ON 08/28/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less