This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/10/2022 at 04:50:53 (UTC).

CHARLES ANTOINE SCHULTZ VS. GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 CHARLES ANTOINE SCHULTZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charles Antoine Schultz

Kathleen Ann Pecora

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Prestige Legal Solutions, P.C.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13063990 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12891983.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13063990 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12891983.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE ON 06/21/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE ON 06/21/2022

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41349616 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2022 04:03:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE ON 06/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31169612 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2022 08:53:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SCHULTZ, CHARLES ANTOINE; PECORA, KATHLEEN ANN ON 06/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13063990 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12891983.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 06/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant