This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:07 (UTC).

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 VS. JIM BONANNO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO HVH10183 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JIM BONANNO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183

Defendants and Others

DRAPER DRYWALL

JIM BONANNO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JIM BONANNO

BLACK ROCK LAGUNA HOUSE, LLC

MARK MCPHERSON

KIM MCPHERSON

BLACK ROCK LAGUNA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP

Defendant and Other Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

Cross Defendant Attorney

KULUVA, ARMIJO & GARCIA

 

Court Documents

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 02/26/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 04/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 04/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 04/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 04/07/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3478099 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3478099 REJECTED.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/23/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 08/31/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 08/31/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DRAPER DRYWALL ON 09/06/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DRAPER DRYWALL ON 09/06/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BONANNO, JIM ON 06/30/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BONANNO, JIM ON 06/30/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND) FILED BY DRAPER DRYWALL ON 11/21/2016

STIPULATION AND ORDER (EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND) FILED BY DRAPER DRYWALL ON 11/21/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/28/2017 09:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/28/2017 09:45:00 AM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12036402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11860406.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12036402 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11860406.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/28/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 04/03/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 04/03/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRAPER DRYWALL ON 06/27/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRAPER DRYWALL ON 06/27/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 02/26/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY BONANNO, JIM; MCPHERSON, KIM; BLACK ROCK LAGUNA, LLC; BLACK ROCK LAGUNA HOUSE, LLC ON 08/31/2016

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY BONANNO, JIM; MCPHERSON, KIM; BLACK ROCK LAGUNA, LLC; BLACK ROCK LAGUNA HOUSE, LLC ON 08/31/2016

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY) FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4801326 RECEIVED ON 01/03/2018 12:09:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 04/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/04/2017 01:41:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3400882 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2016 04:45:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2447637 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 09:31:11 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 03/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3386154 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016 10:50:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927712 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751937.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. HVH10183 ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446696 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:58:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.