This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2022 at 06:40:22 (UTC).

CERISE LYNN JOSEFSBERG VS. ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 CERISE LYNN JOSEFSBERG filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cerise Lynn Josefsberg

Respondents

Don Barnes

Orange County Sheriff's Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Henry J. Josefsberg

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982979 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810900.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982979 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810900.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/14/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/14/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY DON BARNES; ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ON 02/23/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY DON BARNES; ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ON 02/23/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21122707 RECEIVED ON 02/14/2022 05:13:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY DON BARNES; ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT ON 02/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982979 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810900.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41274890 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2021 07:27:44 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 12/13/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY JOSEFSBERG, CERISE LYNN ON 12/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less