This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 09:50:30 (UTC).

CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC VS. SAMEH GUIRGIS

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SAMEH GUIRGIS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

Defendant

SAMEH GUIRGIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Burke, Williams & Sorensen LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/18/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/18/2020

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2966088 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2966088 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY GUIRGIS, SAMEH ON 12/14/2020

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY GUIRGIS, SAMEH ON 12/14/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/11/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/11/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/08/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/08/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12816333 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12643399.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12816333 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12643399.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (UD SUPPLEMENTAL) FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (UD SUPPLEMENTAL) FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • DocketCENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2021
  • DocketGUIRGIS, SAMEH DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2968027 RECEIVED ON 12/18/2020 03:53:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2966088 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3963144 RECEIVED ON 12/14/2020 02:10:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY GUIRGIS, SAMEH ON 12/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1793321 RECEIVED ON 12/08/2020 04:58:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12816333 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12643399.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41138122 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2020 03:36:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (UD SUPPLEMENTAL) FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC ON 12/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC is a litigant