This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 02:28:00 (UTC).

CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC VS. RACHID LAHIK

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RACHID LAHIK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

RACHID LAHIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/18/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/18/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/29/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/29/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12077535 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11901499.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12077535 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11901499.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/15/16) RECEIVED ON 12/13/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/15/16) RECEIVED ON 12/13/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/15/16) RECEIVED ON 12/13/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/15/16) RECEIVED ON 12/13/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/15/16) RECEIVED ON 12/13/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/15/16) RECEIVED ON 12/13/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/13/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/13/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/13/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12065779 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11889744.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12065779 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11889744.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12061025 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11884990.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12061025 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11884990.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 11/10/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 11/10/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 11/10/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 11/10/2016

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 04/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1378492 RECEIVED ON 04/10/2017 03:26:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 12/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 11/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12065779 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11889744.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3481677 RECEIVED ON 11/21/2016 10:04:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12061025 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11884990.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 11/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 11/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CENTERPOINTE SPECTRUM APARTMENTS LLC ON 11/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4634076 RECEIVED ON 11/10/2016 05:08:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less