This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:14 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. SIMA MASROUR

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SIMA MASROUR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

SIMA MASROUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

Defendant Attorney

MADAEN LAW, INC.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928151 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752376.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928151 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752376.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/02/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/02/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12180794 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12004504.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12180794 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12004504.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/11/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/11/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 06/01/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 06/01/2017

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MASROUR, SIMA ON 06/28/2017

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MASROUR, SIMA ON 06/28/2017

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/02/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3585439 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2017 08:37:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12180794 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12004504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY MASROUR, SIMA ON 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2568041 RECEIVED ON 06/28/2017 01:57:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 09/22/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/22/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4530513 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2016 11:57:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928151 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752376.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307130 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:28:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less