This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:31 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. PETE FERRA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PETE FERRA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

PETE FERRA SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/30/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/30/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928254 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752472.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928254 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752472.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4618507 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4618507 REJECTED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4642530 RECEIVED ON 11/30/2016 08:13:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4618507 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928254 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752472.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509881 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:37:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.