This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 09:50:11

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Cavalry Spv I Llc against Moises Torres in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Cavalry Spv I, Llc
  • Represented By
    • Quall Cardot Llp
  • Defendant Moises Torres
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Alma Barrera
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/2...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/2...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILE...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILE...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTH...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTH...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON ...

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON ...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON ...

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON ...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/201...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/201...

Fees Apply
COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

Fees Apply
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/...

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/...

Fees Apply
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2017 AT 09:00...

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2017 AT 09:00...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
  • 03/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
  • 03/16/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 03/16/2017
  • 03/21/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4694488 RECEIVED ON 03/16/2017 11:44:25 PM.
  • 03/06/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 05/23/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/23/2016
  • 05/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1323509 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2016 09:26:30 AM.
  • 05/23/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/23/2016
  • 05/25/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1323508 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2016 09:25:05 AM.
  • 03/01/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928268 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752486.
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446876 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:52:10 PM.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.