This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/20/2017 09:51:12

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Cavalry Spv I Llc against Michelle M Sparks in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 02/26/2016
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Cavalry Spv I, Llc
  • Represented By
    • Quall Cardot Llp
  • Defendant Michelle M Sparks
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/2...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/2...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED B...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED B...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 0...

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 0...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTH...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTH...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON ...

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON ...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/201...

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/201...

Fees Apply
COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

Fees Apply
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/...

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
  • 06/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
  • 06/08/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 06/08/2016
  • 06/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2468995 RECEIVED ON 06/08/2016 01:53:09 PM.
  • 04/05/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/05/2016
  • 04/05/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/05/2016
  • 04/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3399690 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2016 01:52:05 PM.
  • 02/29/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927590 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751815.
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509879 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:33:48 PM.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.