This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:15 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. MARIANNE PEREZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIANNE PEREZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

MARIANNE PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/02/2018

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/02/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/30/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/30/2017 09:00:00 AM.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12293427 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12117195.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12293427 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12117195.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928264 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752482.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928264 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752482.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/06/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 09/06/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/19/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/19/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

PROOF OF SERVICE (DEFENDENTS RESPONSE) FILED BY PEREZ, MARIANNE ON 09/26/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE (DEFENDENTS RESPONSE) FILED BY PEREZ, MARIANNE ON 09/26/2017

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/02/2018

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/02/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/02/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/02/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PEREZ, MARIANNE ON 09/18/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PEREZ, MARIANNE ON 09/18/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/02/2018.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/02/2018.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED 03/08/2018 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED 03/08/2018 09:30:00 AM.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 03/27/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • COURT TRIAL CONTINUED TO 07/11/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING (GRANTING MOTION TO DEEM GENUINENESS OF DOCUMENTS AND DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED 03/08/2018 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED SCHEDULED FOR 03/08/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12293427 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12117195.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 09/29/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/29/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2565150 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2017 10:16:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928264 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752482.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509897 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:56:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less