This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/27/2023 at 03:50:43 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. KIMBERLY VECCHIO

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIMBERLY VECCHIO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Defendant

Kimberly Vecchio

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gurstel Law Firm, P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER (B & P 6322.1) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER (B & P 6322.1) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF VENUE) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF VENUE) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163764 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991861.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163764 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991861.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/18/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/18/2023

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/26/2023

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/26/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31261860 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2023 10:15:33 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21260371 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2023 05:43:17 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163764 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991861.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21258194 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2023 09:16:22 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (OF VENUE) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (B & P 6322.1) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less