This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:02 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. HAE LEE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAE LEE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

HAE LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2018

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/12/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/12/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12282188 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12105928.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12282188 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12105928.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927658 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751883.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927658 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751883.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 03/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 03/24/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 01/16/2018) RECEIVED ON 01/12/2018.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 01/16/2018) RECEIVED ON 01/12/2018.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12282188 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12105928.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 01/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 01/16/2018) RECEIVED ON 01/12/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2629696 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2018 11:06:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR CAVALRY SPV I, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST LEE, HAE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 12/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2513933 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2016 02:33:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 03/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3395042 RECEIVED ON 03/24/2016 11:42:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927658 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751883.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446856 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:31:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less