This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:50 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. BYANKA MEDINA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BYANKA MEDINA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

BYANKA MEDINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752475.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752475.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 06/02/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 06/02/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4733676 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2017 08:09:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 04/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3401098 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2016 11:40:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928257 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752475.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446873 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:44:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.