This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:47 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS. ANALIZETH CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANALIZETH CASTILLO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

ANALIZETH CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/12/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/12/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 10/11/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 10/11/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/09/2017.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/09/2017.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 10/31/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 10/31/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752479.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752479.

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CCP1033) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: CCP1033) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12070173.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12070173.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/01/2016

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/01/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/01/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/01/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246432 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12070173.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/01/2017) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2608000 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017 03:30:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR CAVALRY SPV I, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST CASTILLO, ANALIZETH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 11/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4628892 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2016 12:15:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 10/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4618493 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2016 08:32:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752479.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509892 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:49:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.