This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2018 at 09:27:36 (UTC).

CASTILLO - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CASTILLO - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MELANIE LADNER

Guardian Ad Litems

MICHAEL LADNER

JOYCE LADNER

LINDA M CASTILLO

Minors

IAN M CASTILLO

GIOVANNI A CASTILLO

Not Classified By Court

ALEXANDER A CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

THE ENGLISH LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • (P) REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/11/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) REVIEW HEARING 04/09/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • CONTINUED TO AT IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR SUBMITTED BY LADNER, MICHAEL; LADNER, JOYCE REJECTED ON 02/27/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP SUBMITTED BY LADNER, MICHAEL; LADNER, JOYCE REJECTED ON 02/27/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED BY LADNER, MICHAEL; LADNER, JOYCE ON 02/27/2018; Filing Party: LADNER, MICHAEL; LADNER, JOYCE ON 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • REVIEW OF THE CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/20/2018; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • REVIEW OF THE CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/20/2018; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • REVIEW OF THE CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/20/2018; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • REVIEW OF THE CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIANSHIP STATUS REPORT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/20/2018; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
150 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OR CONSERVATOR FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DUTIES OF GUARDIAN FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CONSENT FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR(S) FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM FILED BY CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CASTILLO, LINDA MICHELE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.