This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:58 (UTC).

CASHCALL INC. VS. SCOTT YELIN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 CASHCALL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCOTT YELIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC.

Defendant

SCOTT YELIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 09/13/2013; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 09/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11447956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11271868.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less