This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:15:04 (UTC).

CASHCALL INC. VS. GRACE VAUGHN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 CASHCALL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRACE VAUGHN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC.

Defendant

GRACE VAUGHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 02/09/2015; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 02/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 12/22/2014; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS / TELEPHONE NUMBER FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 12/22/2014; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 12/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 12/22/2014; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 12/2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11577332 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11401257.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2014
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 03/28/2014; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 03/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 10/23/2013; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 10/2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/23/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 09/16/2013; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 09/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11447926 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11271838.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CASHCALL INC. ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: CASHCALL INC. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less