This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 07:45:13 (UTC).

CASEY LETCHER VS CHERI LETCHER

Case Summary

On 05/01/2017 CASEY LETCHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHERI LETCHER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SARMIENTO, SALVADOR. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3572

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

SARMIENTO, SALVADOR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LETCHER, CASEY

Respondent

LETCHER, CHERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOORE, SCHULMAN & MOORE, APC

Respondent Attorney

MOSHIER, JENNIFER K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 09/18/2018 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filing Party: LETCHER, CHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 06/12/2018 Petitioner's Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/17/2018 Proof of Service by Mail, dated May 16, 2018; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/10/2018; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 05/10/2018; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 04/25/2018 change of address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 04/19/2018; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - EXPEDITED JUDGMENT 03/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 03/22/2018; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/22/2018; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 06/30/2017; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL 06/13/2017; Filing Party: LETCHER, CHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL 06/07/2017; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • MOTION - QUASH 06/06/2017 service of summons Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: LETCHER, CHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 06/06/2017; Filing Party: LETCHER, CHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/06/2017; Filing Party: LETCHER, CHERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/22/2017; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/01/2017; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • SUMMONS 05/01/2017; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/01/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: LETCHER, CASEY

    Read MoreRead Less