Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 14:51:29 (UTC).

CASELLA - PROBATE

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 CASELLA - PROBATE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Decedent

DOROTHY G CASELLA

Administrator With Will Annexed

GREGORY ALDRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator With Will Annexed Attorney

AARON CHARLES GREGG, APLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: (P) REVIEW HEARING; Department: C08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1835223 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2021 10:58:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketORDER FOR PROBATE FILED BY ALDRED, GREGORY ON 04/14/2021; Filing Party: ALDRED, GREGORY ON 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1831772 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2021 09:58:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAGREEMENT TO APPEAR FILED BY ALDRED, GREGORY ON 04/06/2021; Filing Party: ALDRED, GREGORY ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2994389 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS OF ADMIN. WITH WILL ANNEXED 03/11/2021 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41169090 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2021 05:13:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2984527 RECEIVED ON 02/16/2021 01:11:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ALDRED, GREGORY ON 02/16/2021; Filing Party: ALDRED, GREGORY ON 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS OF ADMIN. WITH WILL ANNEXED SCHEDULED FOR 03/11/2021 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1811160 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2021 02:08:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ALDRED, GREGORY ON 02/09/2021; Filing Party: ALDRED, GREGORY ON 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket(P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS OF ADMIN. WITH WILL ANNEXED SCHEDULED FOR 03/11/2021 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 196 - FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION OR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, OR THE FIRST PETITION FOR SPECIAL LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH THE POWERS OF A GENERAL PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12841749 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12669268.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1809052 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021 05:03:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED BY ALDRED, GREGORY ON 02/02/2021; Filing Party: ALDRED, GREGORY ON 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less