This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2023 at 03:41:37 (UTC).

TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS. THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2023 TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc.

Defendants

Russell Carl Patterson

The Patterson Company, Inc.

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pitre & Teunisse, Inc.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/01/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/01/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/01/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/01/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13232895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13061043.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13232895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13061043.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/31/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/31/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11155238 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11155238 REJECTED.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/27/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/27/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/27/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/27/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/20/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/20/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 08/08/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 08/08/2023

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 08/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41525363 RECEIVED ON 08/08/2023 01:12:42 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41517239 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2023 09:10:41 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41507933 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2023 04:06:12 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21331911 RECEIVED ON 06/27/2023 04:06:11 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11155238 REJECTED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/31/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13232895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13061043.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21320759 RECEIVED ON 06/01/2023 03:29:08 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 06/01/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 06/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less