This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/13/2023 at 03:43:17 (UTC).

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY VS. SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allstate Indemnity Company

Allstate Insurance Company

Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company

Encompass Insurance Company

Integon National Insurance Company

Northlight Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Edison International

Southern California Edison Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schroeder Loscotoff Stevens LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/31/2023

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/31/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13237466 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13065614.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13237466 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13065614.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/19/2023 03:45:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/19/2023 03:45:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/11/2023 09:24:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/11/2023 09:24:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

09/13/2023

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HURWITZ; Department: CX103

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/11/2023 09:24:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023

DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT CX103.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/19/2023 03:45:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LON F. HURWITZ FOR ALL PURPOSES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketRELATED CASES INCLUDE: 30-2022-01260545.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13237466 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13065614.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11149179 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2023 01:40:27 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 05/31/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY; ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY; ENCOMPASS INSURANCE COMPANY; NORTHLIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/31/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less