This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 03:44:31 (UTC).

ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE VS. THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2023 ORCO BLOCK HARDSCAPE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Orco Block & Hardscape

Defendants

Argonaut Insurance Company

The Patterson Company, Inc.

Tovey/Shultz Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WCH Law Group, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

Pitre & Teunisse, Inc.

Baker & Baker

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/16/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/16/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/16/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/16/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13240357 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13068505.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13240357 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13068505.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/22/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/22/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 07/12/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 07/12/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 07/12/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 07/12/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 07/12/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 07/12/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC.; ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/31/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TOVEY/SHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC.; ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/31/2023

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (2023-01328609) FILED ON 07/31/2023

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (2023-01328609) FILED ON 07/31/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13261319 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13089467.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13261319 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13089467.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK - SUBMITTED MATTER 08/21/2023 04:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK - SUBMITTED MATTER 08/21/2023 04:00:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC. ON 08/11/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC. ON 08/11/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13274396 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13102545.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13274396 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13102545.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GASTELUM; Department: C11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13274396 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13102545.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11181208 RECEIVED ON 08/11/2023 04:47:47 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK - SUBMITTED MATTER 08/21/2023 04:00:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 10/31/2023 AT 08:45 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE JOHN C. GASTELUM FOR ALL PURPOSES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketRELATED CASES INCLUDE: 2023-01328609 TOVEY/SCHULTZ CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE PATTERSON COMPANY, INC. ON 08/11/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13261319 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13089467.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 07/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31335776 RECEIVED ON 07/12/2023 02:42:22 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41505491 RECEIVED ON 06/22/2023 10:57:32 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/22/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 06/16/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13240357 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13068505.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ORCO BLOCK & HARDSCAPE ON 06/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21327442 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2023 11:21:36 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less