This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/01/2023 at 03:44:16 (UTC).

KIMBERLY SANCHEZ VS. CELLCO PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 KIMBERLY SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CELLCO PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Sanchez

Defendant

Cellco Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terry K. Davis

Defendant Attorney

Jackson Lewis P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13226958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13055105.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13226958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13055105.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/25/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/25/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CELLCO PARTNERSHIP ON 07/07/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CELLCO PARTNERSHIP ON 07/07/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LARSH; Department: C20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21336077 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2023 08:48:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CELLCO PARTNERSHIP ON 07/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11147376 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2023 03:48:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13226958 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13055105.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41491682 RECEIVED ON 05/19/2023 11:39:12 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LARSH, ERICK ON 05/19/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SANCHEZ, KIMBERLY ON 05/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less