This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/17/2023 at 03:40:54 (UTC).

HOA LLC VS. JACK CHREST

Case Summary

On 07/05/2023 HOA LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JACK CHREST. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOA LLC

Defendant

Jack Chrest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Richardson, Sontag & Le, LLP.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13249596 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13077744.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13249596 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13077744.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 07/24/2023.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 07/24/2023.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13261350 AND RECEIPT

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13261350 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13089498.

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY HOA LLC ON 08/02/2023

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY HOA LLC ON 08/02/2023

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING (UD) FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING (UD) FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/07/2023

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/07/2023

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED ON 09/07/2023

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED ON 09/07/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13281415 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13109564.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13281415 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13109564.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 214 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13281415 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13109564.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED ON 09/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21362324 RECEIVED ON 09/05/2023 06:06:52 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING (UD) FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31359984 RECEIVED ON 09/05/2023 06:06:59 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY HOA LLC ON 09/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13261350 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13089498.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31340564 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2023 09:37:45 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 07/24/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13249596 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13077744.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31332567 RECEIVED ON 07/05/2023 05:35:07 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HERNANDEZ, ALMA ON 07/05/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HOA LLC ON 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less