This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/10/2023 at 20:01:47 (UTC).

JOON S CHOI VS. OPEN BANK

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 JOON S CHOI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OPEN BANK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOON S CHOI

Defendant

OPEN BANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/31/2023

HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: CM01

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/31/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN CM01 AT COSTA MESA JUSTICE COMPLEX.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARINGS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/15/2023; Filing Party: THE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CHOI, JOON S FOR 08 - REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING IF DEFENDANT SERVED IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13239638 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13067786.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketREQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY CHOI, JOON S ON 06/15/2023; Filing Party: CHOI, JOON S ON 06/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/06/2023 01:30:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 07/10/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT CM01 PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY CHOI, JOON S ON 04/27/2023; Filing Party: CHOI, JOON S ON 04/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CHOI, JOON-SHIK FOR 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13215380 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13043511.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketCERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY CHOI, JOON S ON 04/27/2023; Filing Party: CHOI, JOON S ON 04/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketREQUEST FOR INTERPRETER (CIVIL) FILED BY CHOI, JOON S ON 04/27/2023; Filing Party: CHOI, JOON S ON 04/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CHOI, JOON-SHIK FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13215369 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13043500.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN CM02/VCC5 AT COSTA MESA JUSTICE COMPLEX.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CHOI, JOON S ON 04/27/2023; Filing Party: CHOI, JOON S ON 04/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less