This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/31/2023 at 03:44:23 (UTC).

BRYAN LE VS. COASTAL AUTO SALES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 BRYAN LE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COASTAL AUTO SALES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Le

Defendants

Coastal Auto Sales, Inc.

Hudson Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Paul Mankin, APC

Defendant Attorney

Gascou Hopkins LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13226519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13054666.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13226519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13054666.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/24/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/24/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/24/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/24/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/25/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/25/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/22/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/22/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13247557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13075705.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13247557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13075705.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13247557 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13075705.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11158244 RECEIVED ON 06/22/2023 07:44:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY ON 06/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31315930 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2023 03:16:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31315393 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2023 04:03:35 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41493623 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2023 11:52:47 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13226519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13054666.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11144185 RECEIVED ON 05/18/2023 03:08:45 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LE, BRYAN ON 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less