This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/19/2023 at 16:02:30 (UTC).

OK KIM VS. ADT SECURITY SERVICES

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 OK KIM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADT SECURITY SERVICES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OK KIM

Defendants

ADT SECURITY SERVICES

SAFE STREETS USA LLC

ADT LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: CM02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/17/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN CM02 AT COSTA MESA JUSTICE COMPLEX.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY KIM, OK ON 05/02/2023; Filing Party: KIM, OK ON 05/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketAMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF FILED BY KIM, OK ON 05/02/2023; Filing Party: KIM, OK ON 05/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURT LOCATION AND DEPARTMENT CHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURT LOCATION AND DEPARTMENT CHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY KIM, OK FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13214018 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13042149.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/12/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY KIM, OK ON 04/25/2023; Filing Party: KIM, OK ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less