This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/15/2023 at 03:45:35 (UTC).

GISELA CASTILLO VS. ESTES EXPRESS LINES

Case Summary

On 07/03/2023 GISELA CASTILLO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ESTES EXPRESS LINES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gisela Castillo

Defendants

Estes Express Lines

Estes Express Lines, Incorporated

Estes Terminals of California LLC

Estes West, Inc.

G. I. Trucking Company

Katrina Fujikama

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Valiant Law

Defendant Attorney

Gilbert & Sackman

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/24/2023

PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/24/2023

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 09/08/2023

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 09/08/2023

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 08/22/2023

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 08/22/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13276077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13104226.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13276077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13104226.

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/24/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/24/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 08/18/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 08/18/2023

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11180295 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11180295 REJECTED.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 08/10/2023

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 08/10/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 08/02/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 08/02/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/26/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/26/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/26/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/26/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/24/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/24/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/08/2023

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LARSH; Department: C20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31355542 RECEIVED ON 08/24/2023 06:16:13 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 09/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21364030 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2023 02:42:48 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41531547 RECEIVED ON 08/22/2023 09:49:19 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketMOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SCHEDULED FOR 01/11/2024 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13276077 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13104226.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31355539 RECEIVED ON 08/24/2023 06:16:12 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ESTES WEST, INC. ON 08/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
07/26/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41519713 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2023 09:57:07 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31340838 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2023 01:29:26 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13248191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13076339.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21333987 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2023 09:49:35 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LARSH, ERICK ON 07/03/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/03/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/03/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CASTILLO, GISELA ON 07/03/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less