This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 05/08/2023 at 13:11:34 (UTC).

BAKER - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 BAKER - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CMC

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Conservator

PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

ALLEN BAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: PETITION TO APPOINT PROBATE CONSERVATOR; Department: CM04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: EX PARTE; Department: CM03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21309162 RECEIVED ON 05/05/2023 09:24:49 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCITATION RECEIVED ON 05/05/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE CONTINUED TO 05/11/2023 AT 01:35 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/04/2023 01:35:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11137082 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2023 02:02:18 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/03/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31305340 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2023 11:44:29 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketPUBLIC GUARDIAN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 05/01/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/01/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/2023 AT 01:35:00 PM IN CM03 AT COSTA MESA JUSTICE COMPLEX.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31303207 RECEIVED ON 04/28/2023 08:11:20 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 04/28/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OR CONSERVATOR FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less