This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 05/12/2023 at 12:24:00 (UTC).

CROSBY - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 CROSBY - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CMC

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

CODY CROSBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Conservatee Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2024
  • HearingDescription: (P) ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Department: CM04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketREPORT OF FIREARM PROHIBITION/RELEASE FILED AND COPY SENT TO DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2023; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketTHE COURT SETS A (P) ACCOUNTING REVIEW FOR 07/03/2024 AT 03:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT CM04.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPOINTMENT OF LPS CONSERVATOR 05/04/2023 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS GRANTED.; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS GRANTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketPUBLIC GUARDIAN APPOINTED AS CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE OF PUBLIC GUARDIAN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21308280 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2023 04:06:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL REPORT OF INVESTIGATOR FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/03/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41479957 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2023 11:04:25 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31301495 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2023 12:45:02 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCITATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketAPPOINTMENT OF LPS CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CM04 AT COSTA MESA JUSTICE COMPLEX.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41479752 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2023 07:41:58 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketTEMPORARY LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCITATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP AND PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED ON 04/25/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less