This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/05/2023 at 03:49:03 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY VS. ALTA SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2023 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALTA SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern California Edison Company

Defendants

Alta Services, Inc.

Christina Pei Chow

Jotek Development Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levy & Nourafchan, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13277574 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13105723.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13277574 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13105723.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2024 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2024 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 09/07/2023

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 09/07/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 09/11/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 09/11/2023

 

Docket Entries

02/01/2024

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: VU; Department: N15

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 09/11/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21364507 RECEIVED ON 09/11/2023 10:30:51 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 09/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41538679 RECEIVED ON 09/07/2023 11:53:59 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2024 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N15 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13277574 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13105723.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31354542 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2023 10:37:31 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER VU, NATHAN ON 08/23/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ON 08/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less