This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/06/2023 at 03:45:48 (UTC).

SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. VS. OC 405 PARTNERS JOINT VENTURE

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OC 405 PARTNERS JOINT VENTURE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shimmick Construction Company, Inc.

Defendants

American Home Assurance Company

Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

OC 405 Partners Joint Venture

Orange County Transportation Authority

Zurich American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Finch, Thornton & Baird, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,195.00

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,195.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13258295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13086443.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 07/21/2023

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 07/21/2023

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2023 01:48:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2023 01:48:00 PM.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/06/2023

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/01/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/01/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/30/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/30/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/30/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/30/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2023

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11147474 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11147474 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13229665 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13057813.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13229665 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13057813.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/24/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/24/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/24/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/24/2023

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2024
  • HearingDescription: ADR REVIEW HEARING; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,195.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13258295 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13086443.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11164731 RECEIVED ON 07/06/2023 04:30:01 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2023 01:48:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 07/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketTHE ADR REVIEW HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2024 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT W15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 06/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21322725 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2023 04:17:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21319459 RECEIVED ON 05/30/2023 03:59:40 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31316292 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2023 10:32:05 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11147474 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/24/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13229665 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13057813.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31315400 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2023 04:06:20 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 05/24/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SHIMMICK CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. ON 05/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less