This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/06/2023 at 03:41:23 (UTC).

QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION VS. SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QBE Insurance Corporation

Defendants

Edison International

Southern California Edison Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grotefeld Hoffmann

Other Attorneys

GROTEFELD HOFFMANN GORDON OCHOA & EVIN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 05/24/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 05/24/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 05/24/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 05/24/2023

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/24/2023

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/24/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13231973 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13060121.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13231973 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13060121.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 06/01/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 06/01/2023

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/15/2023 09:52:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/15/2023 09:52:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/02/2023 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/02/2023 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

04/29/2024

HearingDescription: COURT TRIAL; Judge: HURWITZ; Department: CX103

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: HURWITZ; Department: CX103

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/02/2023 01:30:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketTHE COURT TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2024 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX103.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketTHE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT CX103.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/15/2023 09:52:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/02/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT CX103.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE LON F. HURWITZ FOR ALL PURPOSES.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketRELATED CASES INCLUDE: 30-2022-01260545.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41496986 RECEIVED ON 06/01/2023 03:47:49 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 06/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13231973 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13060121.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31315551 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2023 07:48:06 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SHERMAN, RANDALL ON 05/24/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 05/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 05/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less