This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2023 at 03:51:26 (UTC).

BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION VS. NOVA FREIGHT LLC

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NOVA FREIGHT LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Balboa Capital Corporation

Defendants

Joshua Murega Mwongera

Nova Freight LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michelle A. Chiongson

Marisa D. Poulos

Michael H. Raichelson

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13230310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13058458.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13230310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13058458.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/25/2024 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/25/2024 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 07/03/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 07/03/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 07/03/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 07/03/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: DOURBETAS; Department: C25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 07/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31331837 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2023 01:17:50 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 07/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11163258 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2023 01:17:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/25/2024 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13230310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13058458.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41494293 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2023 12:16:58 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DOURBETAS, NICO ON 05/25/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 05/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less