This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 05/08/2023 at 12:22:46 (UTC).

PARK - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 PARK - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CMC

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Conservator

PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

LINDA PARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: PETITION TO APPOINT PROBATE CONSERVATOR; Department: CM04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: EX PARTE; Department: CM03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31306380 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2023 02:22:25 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCITATION FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/04/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21308682 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2023 12:14:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21308681 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2023 12:13:58 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (P) FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/04/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/04/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31304806 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2023 01:43:33 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (P) FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/02/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 05/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 05/01/2023 AT 01:35:00 PM IN CM03 AT COSTA MESA JUSTICE COMPLEX.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2023 AT 01:35:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2023 AT 01:35:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31300327 RECEIVED ON 04/21/2023 01:48:51 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OR CONSERVATOR FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 04/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less