This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/28/2023 at 03:42:41 (UTC).

SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC VS. ELEVATE MED SPA AND WEIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELEVATE MED SPA AND WEIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Simple Medical, Inc

Petitioners

Roland Fuertez

Rula R Fuertez

Defendants

Dr. Whatley Health and Wellness Corp

Elevate Med Spa and Weight Management LLC

Ontario Medical Weight Control, Inc

Peter Dustin

Sara Whatley-Dustin

ELEVATE MED SPA AND WEIGHT MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Huffine Chung, APC

Bowse Law Group

Defendant Attorneys

Christina Vanarelli, Inc. A Professional Corporation

Thaler Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13272670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13100819.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13272670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13100819.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/19/2024 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/19/2024 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/28/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/28/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/28/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/28/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 09/06/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 09/06/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DR. WHATLEY HEALTH AND WELLNESS CORP; DUSTIN, PETER; WHATLEY-DUSTIN, SARA ON 09/25/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DR. WHATLEY HEALTH AND WELLNESS CORP; DUSTIN, PETER; WHATLEY-DUSTIN, SARA ON 09/25/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13307408 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13135544.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13307408 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13135544.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ONTARIO MEDICAL WEIGHT CONTROL, INC ON 10/16/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ONTARIO MEDICAL WEIGHT CONTROL, INC ON 10/16/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13307409 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13135545.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13307409 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13135545.

 

Docket Entries

01/19/2024

HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: C32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13307409 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13135545.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21380160 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2023 09:05:41 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13307408 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13135544.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11200250 RECEIVED ON 09/25/2023 12:56:59 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ONTARIO MEDICAL WEIGHT CONTROL, INC ON 10/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DR. WHATLEY HEALTH AND WELLNESS CORP; DUSTIN, PETER; WHATLEY-DUSTIN, SARA ON 09/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 09/06/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41537968 RECEIVED ON 09/06/2023 11:04:09 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31356676 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2023 01:57:28 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31356675 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2023 01:57:25 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/19/2024 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13272670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13100819.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11182310 RECEIVED ON 08/15/2023 02:24:06 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 08/15/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SIMPLE MEDICAL, INC ON 08/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less