This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/08/2023 at 03:49:35 (UTC).

HALEH FAZELI VS. VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 HALEH FAZELI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haleh Fazeli

Defendant

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pro Attorneys, APC

Defendant Attorney

Squire Patton Boggs US LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13231021 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13059169.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13231021 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13059169.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 06/20/2023

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 06/20/2023

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 07/17/2023

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 07/17/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13254321 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13082469.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13254321 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13082469.

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 07/17/2023

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 07/17/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41515678 RECEIVED ON 07/17/2023 12:00:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13254321 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13082469.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31337500 RECEIVED ON 07/17/2023 11:59:11 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11157033 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2023 07:49:22 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 07/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. ON 07/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 06/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13231021 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13059169.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41494956 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2023 01:09:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 05/26/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FAZELI, HALEH ON 05/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less