Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 11:13:13 (UTC).

CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. VS. HEALTH NET, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HEALTH NET, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC

Maxim Management Group, Inc.

CRMW, Inc.

Mahyar Mohases

People for People LLC

Steven Lomonaco

Others and Claimants

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Others

HEALTH NET LIEF INSURANCE COMPANY

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

HEALTH NET, INC.

CENTENE CORPORATION

MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC.

HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Interested Parties

TODD FINANCIAL & INSURANCE SERVICES, INC.

DARREN TODD

RNR Recovery, Inc

NDR Pacific, Inc.

TODD FINANCIAL & INSURANCE SERVICES, I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC

FitzGerald Yap Kreditor LLP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, LLP

WILLIAMS & CONNELLY LLP

Interested Party Attorney

Semnar & Hartman, LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CRMW, INC.; MOHASES, MAHYAR; MAXIM MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.; PEOPLE FOR PEOPLE LLC ON 04/12/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CRMW, INC.; MOHASES, MAHYAR; MAXIM MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC.; PEOPLE FOR PEOPLE LLC ON 04/12/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 04/03/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 04/03/2019

EXHIBIT LIST (REDACTED) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 02/14/2019

EXHIBIT LIST (REDACTED) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 02/14/2019

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 02/14/2019

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 02/14/2019

OBJECTION (TO DECLARATION) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 02/14/2019

OBJECTION (TO DECLARATION) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 02/14/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/14/2019.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 06/14/2019.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CENTENE CORPORATION; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET, INC.; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC. ON 03/14/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CENTENE CORPORATION; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET, INC.; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC. ON 03/14/2019

REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/22/2019

REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/22/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CENTENE CORPORATION; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET, INC.; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC. ON 02/13/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CENTENE CORPORATION; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET, INC.; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC. ON 02/13/2019

OBJECTION (TO RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 09/24/2018

OBJECTION (TO RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 09/24/2018

RESPONSE FILED BY CENTENE CORPORATION; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET, INC.; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC. ON 09/21/2018

RESPONSE FILED BY CENTENE CORPORATION; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET, INC.; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC. ON 09/21/2018

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 08/09/2018

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 08/09/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3675433 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3675433 REJECTED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (REDACTED) FILED BY HEALTH NET, INC.; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC.; CENTENE CORPORATION ON 04/13/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (REDACTED) FILED BY HEALTH NET, INC.; HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA, INC.; HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; MANAGED HEALTH NETWORK, INC.; CENTENE CORPORATION ON 04/13/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 01/19/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 01/19/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/04/2017 02:20:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/04/2017 02:20:00 PM.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 07/07/2017

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 07/07/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12164876 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11988593.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12164876 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11988593.

521 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/25/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/22/2019 03:02:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketAMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2849227 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2019 02:53:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/09/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
846 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND RECEIPT FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12116971 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11940794.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3517999 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2017 05:37:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 03/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NDR Pacific, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RNR Recovery, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CASA BELLA RECOVERY INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant