This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2019 at 13:14:48 (UTC).

CARTAGENA JR. V CARTAGENA

Case Summary

On 11/14/2012 CARTAGENA JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARTAGENA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0838

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

Respondent

CARTAGENA, ALEJANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - RESTORATION FORMER NAME 02/04/2014 14:23:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CARTAGENA, ALEJANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • JUDGMENT 12/11/2013 11:26:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/11/2013 11:26:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • JUDGMENT - DEFAULT 12/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/01/2013 10:44:00 AMENDED # Pages:1; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 08/21/2013 12:01:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 08/20/2013 12:04:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 08/20/2013 11:52:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 04/30/2013 11:30:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/30/2013 11:28:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 04/30/2013 11:28:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 03/25/2013 10:13:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 11/14/2012 15:31:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/14/2012 15:32:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • SUMMONS 11/14/2012 15:32:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CARTAGENA JR., HECTOR L

    Read MoreRead Less