Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 06:50:30 (UTC).

CAROLINE PARK VS. COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 CAROLINE PARK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caroline Park

Defendants

Costco Wholesale Membership, Inc.

Costco Wholesale Corporation

Steven Tang

Scott Brenner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Morey & Upton, LLP

 

Court Documents

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. STEPHANIE GEORGE) FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 03/04/2021

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. STEPHANIE GEORGE) FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 03/04/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12848395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12676027.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12848395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12676027.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: GEORGE; Department: C24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1819019 RECEIVED ON 03/04/2021 04:25:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. STEPHANIE GEORGE) FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 03/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12848395 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12676027.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2986639 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2021 05:17:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 02/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PARK, CAROLINE ON 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant