This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 10:28:54 (UTC).

CAROL A CHURCHILL VS. ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 CAROL A CHURCHILL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol A Churchill

Defendants

Orange County Sheriff Department

Rossmoor Community Service District

Data Ticket, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Carol A. Churchill

Defendant Attorneys

Orange County Counsel

Gutierrez Preciado & House, LLP

Declues, Burkett & Thompson, APC

Gregory J Ferruzzo

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PLEASE SEE DISMSISAL FOR CAUSE OF ACTION) FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 08/30/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PLEASE SEE DISMSISAL FOR CAUSE OF ACTION) FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 08/30/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/30/2021 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/30/2021 08:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT ON 08/13/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT ON 08/13/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755681.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755681.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROSSMOOR COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT ON 08/10/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROSSMOOR COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT ON 08/10/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROSSMOOR COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT ON 08/10/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROSSMOOR COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT ON 08/10/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 08/03/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 08/03/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DATA TICKET, INC. ON 07/30/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DATA TICKET, INC. ON 07/30/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY ROSSMOOR COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT ON 06/18/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY ROSSMOOR COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT ON 06/18/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41204729 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41204729 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 06/14/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 06/14/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 06/14/2021

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 06/14/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/03/2021 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/03/2021 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12879881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12707640.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12879881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12707640.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT ON 04/30/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT ON 04/30/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DATA TICKET, INC. ON 04/16/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DATA TICKET, INC. ON 04/16/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT ON 04/16/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT ON 04/16/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 04/12/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 04/12/2021

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: MOSS; Department: C14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41234720 RECEIVED ON 08/30/2021 03:57:33 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PLEASE SEE DISMSISAL FOR CAUSE OF ACTION) FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 08/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/10/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/30/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ORANGE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT ON 08/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31050727 RECEIVED ON 08/13/2021 04:06:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755681.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1880745 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2021 03:38:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ROSSMOOR COMMUNITY SERVICE DISTRICT ON 08/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY DATA TICKET, INC. ON 01/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41152711 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2021 10:23:52 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/10/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 12/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3965478 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2020 12:28:22 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12822980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12650079.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41142577 RECEIVED ON 12/18/2020 12:50:44 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 12/18/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 12/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CHURCHILL, CAROL A ON 12/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less