This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/23/2019 at 07:10:20 (UTC).

CANEDY V CANEDY

Case Summary

On 12/26/2012 CANEDY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CANEDY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HONER, SHERRI L.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1949

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

HONER, SHERRI L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CANEDY, HEATHER

Claimant

CALSTRS

Respondent

CANEDY, RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ROGERS, THERESA RARICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2014
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 07/09/2014 15:24:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: CANEDY, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER 05/15/2014 08:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/12/2014 12:24:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • JUDGMENT 05/12/2014 12:23:00 # Pages:24; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 05/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 04/25/2014 16:11:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 04/25/2014 16:11:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/25/2014 16:10:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER - CONTINUED BY STIPULATION 04/17/2014 08:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2013
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 01/15/2013 14:44:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/15/2013 16:02:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 01/15/2013 16:01:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 01/15/2013 15:58:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CANEDY, RONALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 01/04/2013 14:33:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: CANEDY, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 01/02/2013 14:48:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CANEDY, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/26/2012 08:14:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: CANEDY, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/26/2012 08:14:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: CANEDY, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • SUMMONS 12/26/2012 08:13:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: CANEDY, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 12/26/2012 08:13:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: CANEDY, HEATHER

    Read MoreRead Less