This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 10:28:25 (UTC).

CANDIDA TORRE VS JOSE TORRE SR

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 CANDIDA TORRE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JOSE TORRE SR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WATSON, WILLIAM. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1159

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

WATSON, WILLIAM

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

TORRE SR, JOSE ANTONIO

TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN GARCIA

COMMUNITY LEGAL AID SOCAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - MOTION - OTHER; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketHEARING - MOTION - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 09/02/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 09/02/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 09/02/2020; Filing Party: TORRE SR, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketACCEPT - WATSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 09/02/2020; Filing Party: TORRE SR, JOSE ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketACCEPT - WATSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 09/02/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 07/06/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: TORRE, CANDIDA NALANI

    Read MoreRead Less