This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2022 at 05:34:05 (UTC).

CANDI L. BROWN VS. ALDEN J. BROWN

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 CANDI L BROWN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALDEN J BROWN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Candi L. Brown

Claimant

K&L Law Group, P.C.

Defendants

North Pole Enterprises, Inc.

Alden J. Brown

Pure Nutrition

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

K&L Law Group, P.C.

Steven Slavitt

Defendant Attorney

The Neshanian Law Firm, Inc.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/07/2021

NOTICE - OTHER (AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON HIS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J.; NORTH POLE ENTERPRISES, INC.; PURE NUTRITION ON 12/07/2021

NOTICE - OTHER (AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON HIS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J.; NORTH POLE ENTERPRISES, INC.; PURE NUTRITION ON 12/07/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/28/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/28/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/28/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/28/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/28/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/28/2021

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/28/2021

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 12/28/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/03/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/03/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/03/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/03/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/04/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/04/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/04/2022

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/04/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES 01/03/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES 01/03/2022 01:30:00 PM.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/05/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/05/2022

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/05/2022

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 01/05/2022

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21187645 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2022 01:16:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 07/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41324227 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21148789 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS 07/18/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11014259 RECEIVED ON 07/18/2022 04:23:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BROWN, ALDEN J. ON 07/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
240 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY BROWN, CANDI L. ON 11/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/09/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1760169 RECEIVED ON 08/14/2020 03:59:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY BROWN, CANDI L. ON 08/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1751987 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2020 07:57:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12759403 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12585796.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BROWN, CANDI L. ON 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BROWN, CANDI L. ON 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BROWN, CANDI L. ON 07/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 07/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K&L LAW GROUP P.C. is a litigant